Senate | 05/25/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |