Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1722 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 1722
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 May 5, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 5, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating an account to promote continuing education for
 certain child care providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 42.0521, Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0521. EARLY CHILD CARE DEVELOPMENT ACCOUNT; DEPOSIT
 OF FEES. (a)  The early child care development account is an
 account in the general revenue fund that may be appropriated only to
 the department for the purposes and activities authorized by this
 section and for reasonable administrative expenses under this
 chapter.
 (b) The account consists of:
 (1) the [The] fees authorized by this chapter and
 received by the department;
 (2)  all money appropriated for the purposes of this
 section;
 (3)  any gifts, grants, or donations received for the
 purposes of this section; and
 (4) interest earned on money in the account.
 (c)  The account is exempt from the application of Section
 403.095, Government Code.
 (d)  The purpose of the account is to support continuing
 education initiatives that:
 (1)  implement infant and toddler child care best
 practices for caregivers of children from birth to age three;
 (2)  promote the development of secure, consistent,
 responsive relationships and attachments between child care
 workers and the infants and toddlers in their care; and
 (3)  provide training and knowledge on the importance
 of the emotional development of infants and toddlers [shall be
 deposited in the general revenue fund].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *