House
|
05/21/2009
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|