E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4718
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4718
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4718
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4718
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4964
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1337
|
Journal Page: 4963
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4963
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Madden, Bohac, Bolton, Morrison, Martinez Fischer, Laubenberg, Orr, Thompson, Anchia, Cook, Merrit
|
Journal Page: 4963
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4963
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4616
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4616
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4616
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4286
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2673
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1935
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1710
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 640
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 640
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|