Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1844 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1844


 AN ACT
 relating to revenue received from the provision of pay telephone
 service to inmates confined in facilities operated by the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 495.025, Government
 Code, as added by Chapter 100 (S.B. 1580), Acts of the 80th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is reenacted to read as
 follows:
 (c) The department shall transfer 50 percent of all
 commissions paid to the department by a vendor under this section to
 the compensation to victims of crime fund established by Subchapter
 B, Chapter 56, Code of Criminal Procedure, and the other 50 percent
 to the credit of the undedicated portion of the general revenue
 fund, except that the department shall transfer the first $10
 million of the commissions collected in any given year under a
 contract awarded under this section to the compensation to victims
 of crime fund established by Subchapter B, Chapter 56, Code of
 Criminal Procedure. This section does not reduce any
 appropriation to the department.
 SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Chapter 1418 (H.B. 3107), Acts
 of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, money dedicated by
 Subsection (c), Section 495.025, Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 100 (S.B. 1580), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2007, to the compensation to victims of crime fund
 established by Subchapter B, Chapter 56, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is rededicated by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1844 passed the Senate on
 May 6, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1844 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor