E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4697
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4697
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4697
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4696
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3489
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1278
|
Journal Page: 4913
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4913
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia and Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4913
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4913
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3953
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 686
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 686
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|