Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1896 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1896


 AN ACT
 relating to the employment of firefighters and police officers and
 the provision of emergency medical services in certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 143, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 143.0052 to read as follows:
 Sec. 143.0052.  FEE FOR EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES.
 (a)  This section applies only to a municipality that:
 (1)  has a population of more than 200,000 and less than
 250,000;
 (2)  is located in a county in which another
 municipality that has a population of more than one million is
 predominately located; and
 (3)  whose emergency medical services are administered
 by a fire department.
 (b)  By resolution of its governing body, a municipality may
 establish a monthly fee for the costs of emergency medical
 services, including salary and overtime related to medical
 personnel. This fee is applicable to each and every customer served
 by a municipal water account and may be collected in conjunction
 with the bill for water services.
 (c)  A municipality acting under this section supersedes any
 authority established under Chapter 286, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 143.127, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a [A]
 fire fighter or police officer may file a grievance as provided by
 this subchapter[. The fire fighter or police officer may file a
 grievance] that relates to any aspect of the fire fighter's or
 police officer's employment covered by this chapter [the same
 aspects of the person's employment over which the civil service
 commission for the employees of the municipality who are not
 subject to this chapter would have lawful jurisdiction, including
 but not limited to a written or oral reprimand, transfers, job
 performance reviews, and job assignments]. The fire fighter or
 police officer may not file a grievance relating to:
 (1) a disciplinary suspension, indefinite suspension,
 promotional pass over, or demotion or other action or decision for
 which a hearing, review, or appeal is otherwise provided by this
 chapter; or
 (2) an allegation of discrimination based, in whole or
 in part, on race, color, religion, sex, or national origin.
 SECTION 3. Section 143.128, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (f) to
 read as follows:
 (a) To begin a grievance action, a fire fighter or police
 officer must file a completed written step I grievance form with the
 person's department head or departmental grievance counselor
 within 30 days after the date the fire fighter or police officer
 knew or should have known of the action or inaction for which the
 person feels aggrieved occurred. A step I grievance form may be
 obtained from the departmental grievance counselor. If the form is
 not timely filed, the grievance is waived.
 (f)  If the supervisor does not provide the response required
 by Subsection (d) before the 16th day after the date the meeting
 occurs, the department head shall sustain the fire fighter's or
 police officer's grievance.
 SECTION 4. Section 143.129, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  If the department head or the department head's
 representative does not provide the response required by Subsection
 (c) before the 16th day after the date the meeting occurs, the
 department head shall sustain the fire fighter's or police
 officer's grievance.
 SECTION 5. Section 147.002, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 147.002. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1) "Firefighter" means a firefighter employed by the
 municipality who is covered by the municipality's fire pension plan
 and is classified by the municipality as nonexempt [exempt]. The
 term does not include a firefighter with a rank that is above that
 of battalion chief or section chief.
 (2) "Firefighter employee group" means an
 organization:
 (A) in which, on or before September 1, 2007,
 firefighters of the municipality have participated and paid dues
 via automatic payroll deduction [for at least one year]; and
 (B) that exists for the purpose, in whole or in
 part, of dealing with the municipality concerning grievances, labor
 disputes, wages, rates of pay, hours of employment, or conditions
 of employment affecting firefighters.
 (3) "Police officer" means a sworn police officer
 employed by the municipality who is covered by the municipality's
 police pension plan and is classified by the municipality as
 nonexempt [exempt]. The term does not include a police officer with
 a rank above that of captain, a civilian, or a municipal marshal.
 (4) "Police officer employee group" means an
 organization:
 (A) in which, on or before September 1, 2007, at
 least three percent of the police officers of the municipality have
 participated and paid dues via automatic payroll deduction [for at
 least one year]; and
 (B) that exists for the purpose, in whole or in
 part, of dealing with the municipality concerning grievances, labor
 disputes, wages, rates of pay, hours of employment, or conditions
 of employment affecting police officers.
 SECTION 6. The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 143.127, 143.128, and 143.129, Local Government Code, apply only to
 grievances filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 grievance filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the grievance was filed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1896 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1896 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 82,
 Nays 64, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor