Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1896 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1896
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the employment of firefighters and police officers and
66 the provision of emergency medical services in certain
77 municipalities.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 143, Local Government
1010 Code, is amended by adding Section 143.0052 to read as follows:
1111 Sec. 143.0052. FEE FOR EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES.
1212 (a) This section applies only to a municipality that:
1313 (1) has a population of more than 200,000 and less than
1414 250,000;
1515 (2) is located in a county in which another
1616 municipality that has a population of more than one million is
1717 predominately located; and
1818 (3) whose emergency medical services are administered
1919 by a fire department.
2020 (b) By resolution of its governing body, a municipality may
2121 establish a monthly fee for the costs of emergency medical
2222 services, including salary and overtime related to medical
2323 personnel. This fee is applicable to each and every customer served
2424 by a municipal water account and may be collected in conjunction
2525 with the bill for water services.
2626 (c) A municipality acting under this section supersedes any
2727 authority established under Chapter 286, Health and Safety Code.
2828 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 143.127, Local
2929 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
3030 (a) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a [A]
3131 fire fighter or police officer may file a grievance as provided by
3232 this subchapter[. The fire fighter or police officer may file a
3333 grievance] that relates to any aspect of the fire fighter's or
3434 police officer's employment covered by this chapter [the same
3535 aspects of the person's employment over which the civil service
3636 commission for the employees of the municipality who are not
3737 subject to this chapter would have lawful jurisdiction, including
3838 but not limited to a written or oral reprimand, transfers, job
3939 performance reviews, and job assignments]. The fire fighter or
4040 police officer may not file a grievance relating to:
4141 (1) a disciplinary suspension, indefinite suspension,
4242 promotional pass over, or demotion or other action or decision for
4343 which a hearing, review, or appeal is otherwise provided by this
4444 chapter; or
4545 (2) an allegation of discrimination based, in whole or
4646 in part, on race, color, religion, sex, or national origin.
4747 SECTION 3. Section 143.128, Local Government Code, is
4848 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (f) to
4949 read as follows:
5050 (a) To begin a grievance action, a fire fighter or police
5151 officer must file a completed written step I grievance form with the
5252 person's department head or departmental grievance counselor
5353 within 30 days after the date the fire fighter or police officer
5454 knew or should have known of the action or inaction for which the
5555 person feels aggrieved occurred. A step I grievance form may be
5656 obtained from the departmental grievance counselor. If the form is
5757 not timely filed, the grievance is waived.
5858 (f) If the supervisor does not provide the response required
5959 by Subsection (d) before the 16th day after the date the meeting
6060 occurs, the department head shall sustain the fire fighter's or
6161 police officer's grievance.
6262 SECTION 4. Section 143.129, Local Government Code, is
6363 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
6464 (e) If the department head or the department head's
6565 representative does not provide the response required by Subsection
6666 (c) before the 16th day after the date the meeting occurs, the
6767 department head shall sustain the fire fighter's or police
6868 officer's grievance.
6969 SECTION 5. Section 147.002, Local Government Code, is
7070 amended to read as follows:
7171 Sec. 147.002. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
7272 (1) "Firefighter" means a firefighter employed by the
7373 municipality who is covered by the municipality's fire pension plan
7474 and is classified by the municipality as nonexempt [exempt]. The
7575 term does not include a firefighter with a rank that is above that
7676 of battalion chief or section chief.
7777 (2) "Firefighter employee group" means an
7878 organization:
7979 (A) in which, on or before September 1, 2007,
8080 firefighters of the municipality have participated and paid dues
8181 via automatic payroll deduction [for at least one year]; and
8282 (B) that exists for the purpose, in whole or in
8383 part, of dealing with the municipality concerning grievances, labor
8484 disputes, wages, rates of pay, hours of employment, or conditions
8585 of employment affecting firefighters.
8686 (3) "Police officer" means a sworn police officer
8787 employed by the municipality who is covered by the municipality's
8888 police pension plan and is classified by the municipality as
8989 nonexempt [exempt]. The term does not include a police officer with
9090 a rank above that of captain, a civilian, or a municipal marshal.
9191 (4) "Police officer employee group" means an
9292 organization:
9393 (A) in which, on or before September 1, 2007, at
9494 least three percent of the police officers of the municipality have
9595 participated and paid dues via automatic payroll deduction [for at
9696 least one year]; and
9797 (B) that exists for the purpose, in whole or in
9898 part, of dealing with the municipality concerning grievances, labor
9999 disputes, wages, rates of pay, hours of employment, or conditions
100100 of employment affecting police officers.
101101 SECTION 6. The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
102102 143.127, 143.128, and 143.129, Local Government Code, apply only to
103103 grievances filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A
104104 grievance filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by
105105 the law in effect on the date the grievance was filed, and the
106106 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
107107 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
108108 ______________________________ ______________________________
109109 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
110110 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1896 passed the Senate on
111111 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
112112 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 30, 2009, by the
113113 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
114114 ______________________________
115115 Secretary of the Senate
116116 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1896 passed the House, with
117117 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 82,
118118 Nays 64, one present not voting.
119119 ______________________________
120120 Chief Clerk of the House
121121 Approved:
122122 ______________________________
123123 Date
124124 ______________________________
125125 Governor