Senate | 04/30/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1777 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 796 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 796 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 610 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |