Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2251 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini, et al. S.B. No. 2251
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 April 22, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 22, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2251 By: Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to memorial monuments on the Capitol grounds, including
 the Tejano monument.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 443, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 443.01525 to read as follows:
 Sec. 443.01525.  TEJANO MEMORIAL MONUMENT.  The State
 Preservation Board shall establish a Tejano memorial monument on
 the historic south grounds of the Capitol that pays tribute to the
 contributions of Tejanos to the State of Texas.
 SECTION 2. Section 443.0152, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Except as provided by Sections 443.01525 and 448.034,
 after September 1, 2009, no additional monuments may be placed on
 the historic grounds of the Capitol.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *