Senate | 05/21/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 801 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 801 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |