Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2309 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Whitmire S.B. No. 2309
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 8, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 8, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2309 By: Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain personnel policies of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice and to certain related duties of the Texas Board of
 Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 492, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 492.017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 492.017.  PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS AND LABOR OVERSIGHT
 COMMITTEE. (a)  The board shall create a professional standards
 and labor oversight committee composed of board members to review
 the implementation of and make necessary recommendations for rule
 and policy changes to increase the retention of department
 employees and reduce vacancies in critical positions held by those
 employees, including changes to:
 (1)  career ladders established for department
 employees;
 (2)  professional development of correctional officers
 and supervisory personnel;
 (3)  labor-management cooperation, recruitment, and
 retention policies; and
 (4)  complaint procedures involving disciplinary
 actions, grievance procedures, and appropriate alternative dispute
 resolution procedures.
 (b)  The board, in conjunction with the professional
 standards and labor oversight committee, shall annually submit to
 the governor and the legislature a report that includes:
 (1)  the results of the review and the recommendations
 considered under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  any actions taken by the board or department
 during the preceding year to increase the retention of department
 employees and reduce vacancies in critical positions held by those
 employees.
 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2009, the Texas Board
 of Criminal Justice shall establish a professional standards and
 labor oversight committee as required by Subsection (a), Section
 492.017, Government Code, as added by this Act. Not later than
 December 1, 2010, the committee shall submit to the governor and the
 legislature the first report required by Subsection (b), Section
 492.017, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *