1 | 1 | | By: Whitmire S.B. No. 2309 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 8, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 8, 2009, sent |
---|
6 | 6 | | to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2309 By: Whitmire |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to certain personnel policies of the Texas Department of |
---|
13 | 13 | | Criminal Justice and to certain related duties of the Texas Board of |
---|
14 | 14 | | Criminal Justice. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 492, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
17 | 17 | | adding Section 492.017 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | Sec. 492.017. PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS AND LABOR OVERSIGHT |
---|
19 | 19 | | COMMITTEE. (a) The board shall create a professional standards |
---|
20 | 20 | | and labor oversight committee composed of board members to review |
---|
21 | 21 | | the implementation of and make necessary recommendations for rule |
---|
22 | 22 | | and policy changes to increase the retention of department |
---|
23 | 23 | | employees and reduce vacancies in critical positions held by those |
---|
24 | 24 | | employees, including changes to: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) career ladders established for department |
---|
26 | 26 | | employees; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) professional development of correctional officers |
---|
28 | 28 | | and supervisory personnel; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (3) labor-management cooperation, recruitment, and |
---|
30 | 30 | | retention policies; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (4) complaint procedures involving disciplinary |
---|
32 | 32 | | actions, grievance procedures, and appropriate alternative dispute |
---|
33 | 33 | | resolution procedures. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (b) The board, in conjunction with the professional |
---|
35 | 35 | | standards and labor oversight committee, shall annually submit to |
---|
36 | 36 | | the governor and the legislature a report that includes: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (1) the results of the review and the recommendations |
---|
38 | 38 | | considered under Subsection (a); and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (2) any actions taken by the board or department |
---|
40 | 40 | | during the preceding year to increase the retention of department |
---|
41 | 41 | | employees and reduce vacancies in critical positions held by those |
---|
42 | 42 | | employees. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2009, the Texas Board |
---|
44 | 44 | | of Criminal Justice shall establish a professional standards and |
---|
45 | 45 | | labor oversight committee as required by Subsection (a), Section |
---|
46 | 46 | | 492.017, Government Code, as added by this Act. Not later than |
---|
47 | 47 | | December 1, 2010, the committee shall submit to the governor and the |
---|
48 | 48 | | legislature the first report required by Subsection (b), Section |
---|
49 | 49 | | 492.017, Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
50 | 50 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
51 | 51 | | * * * * * |
---|