House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2428 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2428 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2215 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 809 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 809 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |