1 | 1 | | 81R26564 YDB-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Nelson S.B. No. 2396 |
---|
3 | 3 | | Substitute the following for S.B. No. 2396: |
---|
4 | 4 | | By: Rose C.S.S.B. No. 2396 |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements |
---|
10 | 10 | | applicable to health and human services agencies. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
13 | 13 | | amended by adding Section 531.0145 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 531.0145. OBSOLETE OR REDUNDANT REPORTING |
---|
15 | 15 | | REQUIREMENTS. (a) Not later than December 1, 2009, the executive |
---|
16 | 16 | | commissioner shall: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) examine the health and human services agency |
---|
18 | 18 | | reporting requirements established by a state statute enacted |
---|
19 | 19 | | before January 1, 2007, and not amended since that date, and |
---|
20 | 20 | | identify each reporting requirement that the executive |
---|
21 | 21 | | commissioner determines: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (A) is not necessary to accomplish the objectives |
---|
23 | 23 | | of the statute that contains the reporting requirement; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (B) is redundant of other statutory reporting |
---|
25 | 25 | | requirements; or |
---|
26 | 26 | | (C) is required under statute to be provided at a |
---|
27 | 27 | | frequency for which data is not available; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) provide to the governor, the lieutenant governor, |
---|
29 | 29 | | the speaker of the house of representatives, the chairs of the |
---|
30 | 30 | | Senate Health and Human Services Committee, House Human Services |
---|
31 | 31 | | Committee, and House Public Health Committee, or those committees' |
---|
32 | 32 | | successors, the state auditor's office, the Legislative Budget |
---|
33 | 33 | | Board, the Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and the |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sunset Advisory Commission an initial report that includes: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (A) each statutory reporting requirement for |
---|
36 | 36 | | which the executive commissioner made the determination described |
---|
37 | 37 | | by Subdivision (1); and |
---|
38 | 38 | | (B) the justification for the executive |
---|
39 | 39 | | commissioner's determination for each reporting requirement; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (3) publish a copy of the initial report in the Texas |
---|
41 | 41 | | Register; and |
---|
42 | 42 | | (4) post a copy of the initial report on the |
---|
43 | 43 | | commission's Internet website. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (b) Not later than the 60th day after the date the executive |
---|
45 | 45 | | commissioner issues the initial report under Subsection (a)(2), the |
---|
46 | 46 | | executive commissioner shall hold a public hearing on the report. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (c) The executive commissioner may not include in the |
---|
48 | 48 | | initial report issued under Subsection (a)(2) a reporting |
---|
49 | 49 | | requirement that: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) is required by federal law; or |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) applies to another state agency in addition to a |
---|
52 | 52 | | health and human services agency. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (d) Not later than the 60th day after the date the executive |
---|
54 | 54 | | commissioner issues the initial report under Subsection (a)(2), the |
---|
55 | 55 | | governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
56 | 56 | | representatives, the chairs of the Senate Health and Human Services |
---|
57 | 57 | | Committee, House Human Services Committee, and House Public Health |
---|
58 | 58 | | Committee, or those committees' successors, and any other person |
---|
59 | 59 | | may submit to the executive commissioner any comments on the |
---|
60 | 60 | | reporting requirements identified by the executive commissioner, |
---|
61 | 61 | | including comments indicating the person believes a specific |
---|
62 | 62 | | reporting requirement is necessary and should continue to be |
---|
63 | 63 | | required under statute. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (e) Not later than May 1, 2010, and after considering the |
---|
65 | 65 | | comments provided under Subsection (d), the executive commissioner |
---|
66 | 66 | | shall: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) issue a final report listing the reporting |
---|
68 | 68 | | requirements the executive commissioner determines: |
---|
69 | 69 | | (A) are not necessary to accomplish the |
---|
70 | 70 | | objectives of the statute that contains the reporting requirement; |
---|
71 | 71 | | (B) are redundant of other statutory reporting |
---|
72 | 72 | | requirements; or |
---|
73 | 73 | | (C) are required under statute to be provided at |
---|
74 | 74 | | a frequency for which data is not available and recommending the |
---|
75 | 75 | | frequency at which the reporting requirement could be fulfilled; |
---|
76 | 76 | | (2) provide to the governor, the lieutenant governor, |
---|
77 | 77 | | the speaker of the house of representatives, the chairs of the |
---|
78 | 78 | | Senate Health and Human Services Committee, House Human Services |
---|
79 | 79 | | Committee, and House Public Health Committee, or those committees' |
---|
80 | 80 | | successors, the state auditor's office, the Legislative Budget |
---|
81 | 81 | | Board, the Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and the |
---|
82 | 82 | | Sunset Advisory Commission a list of each statutory reporting |
---|
83 | 83 | | requirement for which the executive commissioner made the |
---|
84 | 84 | | determination described by Subdivision (1) and, for each statutory |
---|
85 | 85 | | reporting requirement, the justification for the executive |
---|
86 | 86 | | commissioner's determination; and |
---|
87 | 87 | | (3) publish in the Texas Register and post on the |
---|
88 | 88 | | commission's Internet website a list of each statutory reporting |
---|
89 | 89 | | requirement for which the executive commissioner made the |
---|
90 | 90 | | determination described by Subdivision (1). |
---|
91 | 91 | | (f) For each reporting requirement included in the final |
---|
92 | 92 | | report under Subsection (e)(1), it is the intent of the 81st |
---|
93 | 93 | | Legislature that the 82nd Legislature consider repealing the |
---|
94 | 94 | | reporting requirement or amending a statute to decrease the |
---|
95 | 95 | | frequency of the reporting requirement. |
---|
96 | 96 | | (g) This section expires September 1, 2012. |
---|
97 | 97 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|