Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2396 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R26564 YDB-F
 By: Nelson S.B. No. 2396
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 2396:
 By: Rose C.S.S.B. No. 2396


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements
 applicable to health and human services agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0145 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0145.  OBSOLETE OR REDUNDANT REPORTING
 REQUIREMENTS. (a) Not later than December 1, 2009, the executive
 commissioner shall:
 (1)  examine the health and human services agency
 reporting requirements established by a state statute enacted
 before January 1, 2007, and not amended since that date, and
 identify each reporting requirement that the executive
 commissioner determines:
 (A)  is not necessary to accomplish the objectives
 of the statute that contains the reporting requirement;
 (B)  is redundant of other statutory reporting
 requirements; or
 (C)  is required under statute to be provided at a
 frequency for which data is not available;
 (2)  provide to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 the speaker of the house of representatives, the chairs of the
 Senate Health and Human Services Committee, House Human Services
 Committee, and House Public Health Committee, or those committees'
 successors, the state auditor's office, the Legislative Budget
 Board, the Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and the
 Sunset Advisory Commission an initial report that includes:
 (A)  each statutory reporting requirement for
 which the executive commissioner made the determination described
 by Subdivision (1); and
 (B)  the justification for the executive
 commissioner's determination for each reporting requirement;
 (3)  publish a copy of the initial report in the Texas
 Register; and
 (4)  post a copy of the initial report on the
 commission's Internet website.
 (b)  Not later than the 60th day after the date the executive
 commissioner issues the initial report under Subsection (a)(2), the
 executive commissioner shall hold a public hearing on the report.
 (c)  The executive commissioner may not include in the
 initial report issued under Subsection (a)(2) a reporting
 requirement that:
 (1) is required by federal law; or
 (2)  applies to another state agency in addition to a
 health and human services agency.
 (d)  Not later than the 60th day after the date the executive
 commissioner issues the initial report under Subsection (a)(2), the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, the chairs of the Senate Health and Human Services
 Committee, House Human Services Committee, and House Public Health
 Committee, or those committees' successors, and any other person
 may submit to the executive commissioner any comments on the
 reporting requirements identified by the executive commissioner,
 including comments indicating the person believes a specific
 reporting requirement is necessary and should continue to be
 required under statute.
 (e)  Not later than May 1, 2010, and after considering the
 comments provided under Subsection (d), the executive commissioner
 shall:
 (1)  issue a final report listing the reporting
 requirements the executive commissioner determines:
 (A)  are not necessary to accomplish the
 objectives of the statute that contains the reporting requirement;
 (B)  are redundant of other statutory reporting
 requirements; or
 (C)  are required under statute to be provided at
 a frequency for which data is not available and recommending the
 frequency at which the reporting requirement could be fulfilled;
 (2)  provide to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 the speaker of the house of representatives, the chairs of the
 Senate Health and Human Services Committee, House Human Services
 Committee, and House Public Health Committee, or those committees'
 successors, the state auditor's office, the Legislative Budget
 Board, the Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and the
 Sunset Advisory Commission a list of each statutory reporting
 requirement for which the executive commissioner made the
 determination described by Subdivision (1) and, for each statutory
 reporting requirement, the justification for the executive
 commissioner's determination; and
 (3)  publish in the Texas Register and post on the
 commission's Internet website a list of each statutory reporting
 requirement for which the executive commissioner made the
 determination described by Subdivision (1).
 (f)  For each reporting requirement included in the final
 report under Subsection (e)(1), it is the intent of the 81st
 Legislature that the 82nd Legislature consider repealing the
 reporting requirement or amending a statute to decrease the
 frequency of the reporting requirement.
 (g) This section expires September 1, 2012.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.