Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2396 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 9, 2009      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB2396 by Nelson (Relating to the repeal of obsolete or redundant reporting requirements of health and human services agencies.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would abolish obsolete or redundant reporting requirements for health and human service agencies if the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house, and presiding officers of certain committees make that determination. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission to identify reports that should be considered for abolition no later than December 1, 2009.  Any report for which there is no objection as described by the bill would be abolished as of February 1, 2010. It is unclear as to what impact, if any, this bill would have on reporting requirements contained in the General Appropriations Act. The Act would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house.  If the Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, it would take effect September 1, 2009. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:308 State Auditor's Office, 529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, PP, MB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 9, 2009





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB2396 by Nelson (Relating to the repeal of obsolete or redundant reporting requirements of health and human services agencies.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB2396 by Nelson (Relating to the repeal of obsolete or redundant reporting requirements of health and human services agencies.), As Introduced

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB2396 by Nelson (Relating to the repeal of obsolete or redundant reporting requirements of health and human services agencies.), As Introduced

SB2396 by Nelson (Relating to the repeal of obsolete or redundant reporting requirements of health and human services agencies.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would abolish obsolete or redundant reporting requirements for health and human service agencies if the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house, and presiding officers of certain committees make that determination. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission to identify reports that should be considered for abolition no later than December 1, 2009.  Any report for which there is no objection as described by the bill would be abolished as of February 1, 2010. It is unclear as to what impact, if any, this bill would have on reporting requirements contained in the General Appropriations Act. The Act would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house.  If the Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, it would take effect September 1, 2009.

The bill would abolish obsolete or redundant reporting requirements for health and human service agencies if the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house, and presiding officers of certain committees make that determination. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission to identify reports that should be considered for abolition no later than December 1, 2009.  Any report for which there is no objection as described by the bill would be abolished as of February 1, 2010.

It is unclear as to what impact, if any, this bill would have on reporting requirements contained in the General Appropriations Act. The Act would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house.  If the Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, it would take effect September 1, 2009.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 308 State Auditor's Office, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

308 State Auditor's Office, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, PP, MB

 JOB, CL, PP, MB