E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5158
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5982
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4312
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1179
|
Journal Page: 4789
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4789
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4789
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB4832
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 1873
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1873
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|