Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2570 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2570


 AN ACT
 relating to the board of directors of the Kenedy County Groundwater
 Conservation District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 1152, Acts of the 78th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2003, is amended by adding Section 9A to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 9A.  METHOD OF ELECTING DIRECTORS: SINGLE-MEMBER
 DISTRICTS. (a)  As soon as practicable after the effective date of
 the Act by which this section is enacted into law, the board shall:
 (1)  divide the district into five single-member
 districts for electing directors; and
 (2)  assign each of the existing board positions to one
 of the new single-member districts.
 (b)  In dividing the district into single-member districts
 under Subsection (a) of this section, the board shall:
 (1)  take into account the existing at-large board
 position elected by the voters of the Santa Gertrudis Independent
 School District; and
 (2)  draw the single-member districts in a manner that
 retains the existing district lines as closely as possible.
 (c)  If the district annexes territory, the annexed
 territory becomes part of one or more of the single-member
 districts as determined by the board.
 (d)  One director shall be elected from each single-member
 district.
 (e)  To be a candidate for or to serve as a director, a person
 must be a registered voter in the single-member district the person
 represents or seeks to represent.
 (f)  A person shall indicate on the application for a place
 on the ballot the single-member district the person seeks to
 represent.
 (g)  After each federal decennial census or as needed, the
 board may redraw the single-member districts to reflect population
 changes. A director in office on the effective date of a change in
 the boundaries of a single-member district, or a director elected
 or appointed before the effective date of the change whose term of
 office begins on or after the effective date of the change, shall
 serve for the remainder of the director's term in the single-member
 district to which elected or appointed even though the change in
 boundaries places the director's residence outside the district to
 which the director was elected or appointed.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 1162, Acts of the 78th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2003, is amended by adding Section 8A to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8A.  METHOD OF ELECTING DIRECTORS: SINGLE-MEMBER
 DISTRICTS. (a)  As soon as practicable after the effective date of
 the Act by which this section is enacted into law, the board shall:
 (1)  divide the district into five single-member
 districts for electing directors; and
 (2)  assign each of the existing board positions to one
 of the new single-member districts.
 (b)  In dividing the district into single-member districts
 under Subsection (a) of this section, the board shall:
 (1)  take into account the existing at-large board
 position elected by the voters of the Santa Gertrudis Independent
 School District; and
 (2)  draw the single-member districts in a manner that
 retains the existing district lines as closely as possible.
 (c)  If the district annexes territory, the annexed
 territory becomes part of one or more of the single-member
 districts as determined by the board.
 (d)  One director shall be elected from each single-member
 district.
 (e)  To be a candidate for or to serve as a director, a person
 must be a registered voter in the single-member district the person
 represents or seeks to represent.
 (f)  A person shall indicate on the application for a place
 on the ballot the single-member district the person seeks to
 represent.
 (g)  After each federal decennial census or as needed, the
 board may redraw the single-member districts to reflect population
 changes. A director in office on the effective date of a change in
 the boundaries of a single-member district, or a director elected
 or appointed before the effective date of the change whose term of
 office begins on or after the effective date of the change, shall
 serve for the remainder of the director's term in the single-member
 district to which elected or appointed even though the change in
 boundaries places the director's residence outside the district to
 which the director was elected or appointed.
 SECTION 3. The following laws are repealed:
 (1) Section 9, Chapter 1152, Acts of the 78th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2003; and
 (2) Section 8, Chapter 1162, Acts of the 78th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2003.
 SECTION 4. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to a director elected or appointed to serve on the board of
 directors of the Kenedy County Groundwater Conservation District on
 or after the effective date of this Act.
 (b) The change in law made by this Act does not affect the
 term of office of a director serving on the board of directors of
 the Kenedy County Groundwater Conservation District on the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2570 passed the Senate on
 May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2570 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor