Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB291 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 291


 AN ACT
 relating to hepatitis B vaccination for students enrolled in
 certain health-related courses of study at an institution of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 51.933, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A rule adopted under Subsection (b) that requires a
 hepatitis B vaccination for students may apply only to students
 enrolled in a course of study that involves potential exposure to
 human or animal blood or bodily fluids.
 SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2009, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules as required by Subsection (b-1), Section 51.933,
 Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 291 passed the Senate on
 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 291 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor