E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1561
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6897
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4978
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4506
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5287
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5287
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5978
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5978
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5978
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#984
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4006
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hernandez
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4003
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 808
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 642
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 438
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 229
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 229
|
Senate
|
12/02/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|