1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 333 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the retention by a county or municipality of certain |
---|
6 | 6 | | court costs for maintaining and supporting a certified breath |
---|
7 | 7 | | alcohol testing program. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Article 102.016, Code of |
---|
10 | 10 | | Criminal Procedure, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (b) The custodian of a municipal or county treasury in a |
---|
12 | 12 | | county that maintains a certified breath alcohol testing program |
---|
13 | 13 | | but does not use the services of a certified technical supervisor |
---|
14 | 14 | | employed by the department may, to defray the costs of maintaining |
---|
15 | 15 | | and supporting a certified breath alcohol [breath] testing program, |
---|
16 | 16 | | retain $22.50 of each court cost collected under Section 133.102, |
---|
17 | 17 | | Local Government Code, [Article 102.075] on conviction of an |
---|
18 | 18 | | offense under Chapter 49, Penal Code, other than an offense that is |
---|
19 | 19 | | a Class C misdemeanor. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies |
---|
21 | 21 | | only to a court cost collected on or after the effective date of |
---|
22 | 22 | | this Act. A court cost collected before the effective date of this |
---|
23 | 23 | | Act is governed by the law in effect when the court cost was |
---|
24 | 24 | | collected, and the law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a) of this section, the |
---|
26 | 26 | | custodian of a municipal or county treasury may retain any amount |
---|
27 | 27 | | retained under Subsection (b), Article 102.016, Code of Criminal |
---|
28 | 28 | | Procedure, before the effective date of this Act to maintain and |
---|
29 | 29 | | support a certified breath alcohol testing program. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
31 | 31 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
32 | 32 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
33 | 33 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 333 passed the Senate on |
---|
34 | 34 | | March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
35 | 35 | | May 28, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and |
---|
36 | 36 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2009, House |
---|
37 | 37 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
38 | 38 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
39 | 39 | | Nays 0. |
---|
40 | 40 | | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | 41 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
42 | 42 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 333 passed the House, with |
---|
43 | 43 | | amendment, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, |
---|
44 | 44 | | Nays 0, two present not voting; May 29, 2009, House granted request |
---|
45 | 45 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
46 | 46 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
47 | 47 | | following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
48 | 48 | | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | 49 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
50 | 50 | | Approved: |
---|
51 | 51 | | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | 52 | | Date |
---|
53 | 53 | | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | 54 | | Governor |
---|