Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB333 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 333


 AN ACT
 relating to the retention by a county or municipality of certain
 court costs for maintaining and supporting a certified breath
 alcohol testing program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Article 102.016, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The custodian of a municipal or county treasury in a
 county that maintains a certified breath alcohol testing program
 but does not use the services of a certified technical supervisor
 employed by the department may, to defray the costs of maintaining
 and supporting a certified breath alcohol [breath] testing program,
 retain $22.50 of each court cost collected under Section 133.102,
 Local Government Code, [Article 102.075] on conviction of an
 offense under Chapter 49, Penal Code, other than an offense that is
 a Class C misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to a court cost collected on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A court cost collected before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect when the court cost was
 collected, and the law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a) of this section, the
 custodian of a municipal or county treasury may retain any amount
 retained under Subsection (b), Article 102.016, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, before the effective date of this Act to maintain and
 support a certified breath alcohol testing program.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 333 passed the Senate on
 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 28, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 333 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 29, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor