Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4937
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1305
|
Journal Page: 4937
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4937
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4937
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4588
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4588
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4286
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1646
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 186
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 186
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|