E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4171
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4171
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4171
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4170
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2537
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#954
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 618
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 265
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 265
|
Senate
|
01/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|