Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB470 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 470


 AN ACT
 relating to training and continuing education for licensed
 electrical apprentices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1305.002, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (1-b) to read as follows:
 (1-b)  "Apprenticeship training program" means an
 electrical training program that is:
 (A)  recognized by the Texas Workforce Commission
 or the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board;
 (B)  registered with the United States Department
 of Labor; or
 (C)  a competency-based standardized craft
 training program that meets the training program standards of the
 United States Department of Labor Office of Apprenticeship.
 SECTION 2. Section 1305.102, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The commission may adopt rules regarding the
 registration of apprenticeship training programs and to require
 registered programs to report the names of persons enrolled in the
 programs.
 SECTION 3. Section 1305.168, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b) Continuing education courses that satisfy the
 requirements of Subsection (a) [this section] must address safety,
 the National Electrical Code, as adopted under Section 1305.101,
 and state laws and rules that regulate the conduct of license
 holders under this chapter.
 (b-1)  To renew an electrical apprentice license, a license
 holder who is not enrolled in an apprenticeship training program
 must complete four hours of continuing education annually.
 Continuing education courses that satisfy the requirements of this
 subsection must address safety, the National Electrical Code, as
 adopted under Section 1305.101, and state laws and rules that
 regulate the conduct of license holders under this chapter.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 renewal of an electrical apprentice license that expires on or
 after September 1, 2010. A license that expires before September 1,
 2010, is governed by the law in effect on the date the license was
 issued, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 470 passed the Senate on
 March 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 470 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 3, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor