1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 470 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to training and continuing education for licensed |
---|
6 | 6 | | electrical apprentices. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 1305.002, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 9 | | by adding Subdivision (1-b) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (1-b) "Apprenticeship training program" means an |
---|
11 | 11 | | electrical training program that is: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (A) recognized by the Texas Workforce Commission |
---|
13 | 13 | | or the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board; |
---|
14 | 14 | | (B) registered with the United States Department |
---|
15 | 15 | | of Labor; or |
---|
16 | 16 | | (C) a competency-based standardized craft |
---|
17 | 17 | | training program that meets the training program standards of the |
---|
18 | 18 | | United States Department of Labor Office of Apprenticeship. |
---|
19 | 19 | | SECTION 2. Section 1305.102, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
20 | 20 | | by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (d) The commission may adopt rules regarding the |
---|
22 | 22 | | registration of apprenticeship training programs and to require |
---|
23 | 23 | | registered programs to report the names of persons enrolled in the |
---|
24 | 24 | | programs. |
---|
25 | 25 | | SECTION 3. Section 1305.168, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
26 | 26 | | by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as |
---|
27 | 27 | | follows: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) Continuing education courses that satisfy the |
---|
29 | 29 | | requirements of Subsection (a) [this section] must address safety, |
---|
30 | 30 | | the National Electrical Code, as adopted under Section 1305.101, |
---|
31 | 31 | | and state laws and rules that regulate the conduct of license |
---|
32 | 32 | | holders under this chapter. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (b-1) To renew an electrical apprentice license, a license |
---|
34 | 34 | | holder who is not enrolled in an apprenticeship training program |
---|
35 | 35 | | must complete four hours of continuing education annually. |
---|
36 | 36 | | Continuing education courses that satisfy the requirements of this |
---|
37 | 37 | | subsection must address safety, the National Electrical Code, as |
---|
38 | 38 | | adopted under Section 1305.101, and state laws and rules that |
---|
39 | 39 | | regulate the conduct of license holders under this chapter. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies to the |
---|
41 | 41 | | renewal of an electrical apprentice license that expires on or |
---|
42 | 42 | | after September 1, 2010. A license that expires before September 1, |
---|
43 | 43 | | 2010, is governed by the law in effect on the date the license was |
---|
44 | 44 | | issued, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
46 | 46 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
47 | 47 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
48 | 48 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 470 passed the Senate on |
---|
49 | 49 | | March 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
50 | 50 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the |
---|
51 | 51 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
52 | 52 | | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | 53 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | 54 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 470 passed the House, with |
---|
55 | 55 | | amendment, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, |
---|
56 | 56 | | Nays 3, one present not voting. |
---|
57 | 57 | | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | 58 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
59 | 59 | | Approved: |
---|
60 | 60 | | ______________________________ |
---|
61 | 61 | | Date |
---|
62 | 62 | | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | 63 | | Governor |
---|