E | 05/12/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2308 | |
E | 04/30/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1874 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2158 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1723 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#384 | Journal Page: 1990 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1990 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1990 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1895 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1895 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 462 | Journal Page: 1895 |
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1266 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1266 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 644 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 01/23/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |