Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB522 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 522


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of personal leave by a public school employee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 22.003, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (a) A state minimum personal leave program consisting of
 five days per year personal leave with no limit on accumulation and
 transferable among districts shall be provided for school district
 employees. School districts may provide additional personal leave
 beyond this minimum. The board of trustees of a school district may
 adopt a policy governing an employee's use of personal leave
 granted under this subsection, except that the policy may not
 restrict:
 (1) the purposes for which the leave may be used; or
 (2)  the order in which an employee may use the state
 minimum personal leave and any additional personal leave provided
 by the school district.
 (f)  A public school employee who retains any sick leave
 accumulated under former Section 13.904(a), as that section existed
 on January 1, 1995, is entitled to use the sick leave provided under
 that section or the personal leave provided under Subsection (a) in
 any order to the extent that the leave the employee uses is
 appropriate to the purpose of the leave.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 522 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 522 passed the House on
 April 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor