E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4727
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4727
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1110
|
Journal Page: 4563
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4563
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2723
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2997
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#693
|
Journal Page: 2996
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2996
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 2996
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2996
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2718
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2718
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 653
|
Journal Page: 2718
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1179
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 298
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 298
|
Senate
|
01/28/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|