Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB562 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 562


 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion on the exterior of an ad valorem tax bill
 of a statement directing the United States Postal Service to return
 the bill if it is not deliverable as addressed.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 31.01, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsections (f) and (i-1), the
 assessor for each taxing unit shall prepare and mail a tax bill to
 each person in whose name the property is listed on the tax roll and
 to the person's authorized agent. The assessor shall mail tax bills
 by October 1 or as soon thereafter as practicable. The assessor
 shall mail to the state agency or institution the tax bill for any
 taxable property owned by the agency or institution. The agency or
 institution shall pay the taxes from funds appropriated for payment
 of the taxes or, if there are none, from funds appropriated for the
 administration of the agency or institution. The exterior of the
 tax bill must show the return address of the taxing unit. If the
 assessor wants the United States Postal Service to return the tax
 bill if it is not deliverable as addressed, the exterior of the tax
 bill may [and must] contain, in all capital letters, the words
 "RETURN SERVICE REQUESTED," or another appropriate statement
 directing the United States Postal Service to return the tax bill if
 it is not deliverable as addressed.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 562 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 20, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 562 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 8, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 20, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 25, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor