1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 562 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the inclusion on the exterior of an ad valorem tax bill |
---|
6 | 6 | | of a statement directing the United States Postal Service to return |
---|
7 | 7 | | the bill if it is not deliverable as addressed. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 31.01, Tax Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (a) Except as provided by Subsections (f) and (i-1), the |
---|
12 | 12 | | assessor for each taxing unit shall prepare and mail a tax bill to |
---|
13 | 13 | | each person in whose name the property is listed on the tax roll and |
---|
14 | 14 | | to the person's authorized agent. The assessor shall mail tax bills |
---|
15 | 15 | | by October 1 or as soon thereafter as practicable. The assessor |
---|
16 | 16 | | shall mail to the state agency or institution the tax bill for any |
---|
17 | 17 | | taxable property owned by the agency or institution. The agency or |
---|
18 | 18 | | institution shall pay the taxes from funds appropriated for payment |
---|
19 | 19 | | of the taxes or, if there are none, from funds appropriated for the |
---|
20 | 20 | | administration of the agency or institution. The exterior of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | tax bill must show the return address of the taxing unit. If the |
---|
22 | 22 | | assessor wants the United States Postal Service to return the tax |
---|
23 | 23 | | bill if it is not deliverable as addressed, the exterior of the tax |
---|
24 | 24 | | bill may [and must] contain, in all capital letters, the words |
---|
25 | 25 | | "RETURN SERVICE REQUESTED," or another appropriate statement |
---|
26 | 26 | | directing the United States Postal Service to return the tax bill if |
---|
27 | 27 | | it is not deliverable as addressed. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
29 | 29 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
30 | 30 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
31 | 31 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 562 passed the Senate on |
---|
32 | 32 | | April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
33 | 33 | | May 14, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
34 | 34 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 20, 2009, House |
---|
35 | 35 | | granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
36 | 36 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Nays 0. |
---|
38 | 38 | | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | 39 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | 40 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 562 passed the House, with |
---|
41 | 41 | | amendments, on May 8, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135, |
---|
42 | 42 | | Nays 0, two present not voting; May 20, 2009, House granted request |
---|
43 | 43 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
44 | 44 | | May 25, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
45 | 45 | | following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
46 | 46 | | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | 47 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
48 | 48 | | Approved: |
---|
49 | 49 | | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | 50 | | Date |
---|
51 | 51 | | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | 52 | | Governor |
---|