E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4189
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4189
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4189
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4188
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3984
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#959
|
Journal Page: 3983
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3983
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3983
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3891
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3891
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Branch
|
Journal Page: 3891
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 299
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 299
|
Senate
|
01/28/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|