1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 572 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to transportation safety training requirements for |
---|
6 | 6 | | certain child-care providers. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as Jacob's Law. |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 2. Section 42.0421, Human Resources Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (e) In addition to other training required by this section, |
---|
12 | 12 | | the department by rule shall require an owner, operator, or |
---|
13 | 13 | | employee of a day-care center, group day-care home, registered |
---|
14 | 14 | | family home, child-care institution, foster group home, or agency |
---|
15 | 15 | | foster group home who transports a child under the care of the |
---|
16 | 16 | | facility whose chronological or developmental age is younger than |
---|
17 | 17 | | nine years of age to complete at least two hours of annual training |
---|
18 | 18 | | on transportation safety. |
---|
19 | 19 | | SECTION 3. The executive commissioner of the Health and |
---|
20 | 20 | | Human Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by |
---|
21 | 21 | | Subsection (e), Section 42.0421, Human Resources Code, as added by |
---|
22 | 22 | | this Act, not later than March 1, 2010. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
24 | 24 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
25 | 25 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
26 | 26 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 572 passed the Senate on |
---|
27 | 27 | | March 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
28 | 28 | | the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2009, by the |
---|
29 | 29 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
30 | 30 | | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | 31 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
32 | 32 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 572 passed the House, with |
---|
33 | 33 | | amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, |
---|
34 | 34 | | Nays 6, one present not voting. |
---|
35 | 35 | | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | 36 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
37 | 37 | | Approved: |
---|
38 | 38 | | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | 39 | | Date |
---|
40 | 40 | | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | 41 | | Governor |
---|