Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB572 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 572


 AN ACT
 relating to transportation safety training requirements for
 certain child-care providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as Jacob's Law.
 SECTION 2. Section 42.0421, Human Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  In addition to other training required by this section,
 the department by rule shall require an owner, operator, or
 employee of a day-care center, group day-care home, registered
 family home, child-care institution, foster group home, or agency
 foster group home who transports a child under the care of the
 facility whose chronological or developmental age is younger than
 nine years of age to complete at least two hours of annual training
 on transportation safety.
 SECTION 3. The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by
 Subsection (e), Section 42.0421, Human Resources Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than March 1, 2010.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 572 passed the Senate on
 March 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 572 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 6, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor