S.B. No. 572 AN ACT relating to transportation safety training requirements for certain child-care providers. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as Jacob's Law. SECTION 2. Section 42.0421, Human Resources Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: (e) In addition to other training required by this section, the department by rule shall require an owner, operator, or employee of a day-care center, group day-care home, registered family home, child-care institution, foster group home, or agency foster group home who transports a child under the care of the facility whose chronological or developmental age is younger than nine years of age to complete at least two hours of annual training on transportation safety. SECTION 3. The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by Subsection (e), Section 42.0421, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2010. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 572 passed the Senate on March 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 572 passed the House, with amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 6, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor