E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4720
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4720
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4289
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1388
|
Journal Page: 5223
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5223
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4494
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#724
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3028
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Vaught
|
Journal Page: 3028
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3028
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1351
|
Journal Page: 3028
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2540
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|