Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB58 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 58


 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of the Juvenile Justice Case
 Management System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 58.403, Family Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 58.403. JUVENILE INFORMATION SYSTEM. (a)  Through the
 adoption of an interlocal contract under Chapter 791, Government
 Code, with one or more counties, the [The] commission [in
 partnership with local counties] may participate in and assist
 counties in the creation, operation, and maintenance of a
 [statewide] system that is intended for statewide use to:
 (1) aid in processing the cases of children under this
 title;
 (2) facilitate the delivery of services to children in
 the juvenile justice system;
 (3) aid in the early identification of at-risk and
 delinquent children; and
 (4) facilitate cross-jurisdictional sharing of
 information related to juvenile offenders between authorized
 criminal and juvenile justice agencies and partner agencies.
 (b)  The commission may use funds appropriated for the
 implementation of this section to pay costs incurred under an
 interlocal contract described by Subsection (a), including license
 fees, maintenance and operations costs, administrative costs, and
 any other costs specified in the interlocal contract.
 (c)  The commission may provide training services to
 counties on the use and operation of a system created, operated, or
 maintained by one or more counties under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 58 passed the Senate on
 April 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 20, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 58 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 20, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor