Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB58 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 58
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the administration of the Juvenile Justice Case
66 Management System.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Section 58.403, Family Code, is amended to read
99 as follows:
1010 Sec. 58.403. JUVENILE INFORMATION SYSTEM. (a) Through the
1111 adoption of an interlocal contract under Chapter 791, Government
1212 Code, with one or more counties, the [The] commission [in
1313 partnership with local counties] may participate in and assist
1414 counties in the creation, operation, and maintenance of a
1515 [statewide] system that is intended for statewide use to:
1616 (1) aid in processing the cases of children under this
1717 title;
1818 (2) facilitate the delivery of services to children in
1919 the juvenile justice system;
2020 (3) aid in the early identification of at-risk and
2121 delinquent children; and
2222 (4) facilitate cross-jurisdictional sharing of
2323 information related to juvenile offenders between authorized
2424 criminal and juvenile justice agencies and partner agencies.
2525 (b) The commission may use funds appropriated for the
2626 implementation of this section to pay costs incurred under an
2727 interlocal contract described by Subsection (a), including license
2828 fees, maintenance and operations costs, administrative costs, and
2929 any other costs specified in the interlocal contract.
3030 (c) The commission may provide training services to
3131 counties on the use and operation of a system created, operated, or
3232 maintained by one or more counties under Subsection (a).
3333 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
3434 ______________________________ ______________________________
3535 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
3636 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 58 passed the Senate on
3737 April 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0;
3838 May 14, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
3939 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 20, 2009, House
4040 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted
4141 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
4242 Nays 0.
4343 ______________________________
4444 Secretary of the Senate
4545 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 58 passed the House, with
4646 amendments, on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
4747 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 20, 2009, House granted request
4848 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
4949 May 29, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
5050 following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting.
5151 ______________________________
5252 Chief Clerk of the House
5353 Approved:
5454 ______________________________
5555 Date
5656 ______________________________
5757 Governor