E
|
05/29/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
E
|
05/18/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3947
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2492
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2438
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#725
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Vaught
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/8/09 4:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 528
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2297
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 702
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 288
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
02/03/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 129
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|