1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 61 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the offense of failing to secure a child passenger in a |
---|
6 | 6 | | motor vehicle and to fines for the offense. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 545.412, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 9 | | by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to |
---|
10 | 10 | | read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (a) A person commits an offense if the person operates a |
---|
12 | 12 | | passenger vehicle, transports a child who is younger than eight |
---|
13 | 13 | | [five] years of age, unless the child is taller than four feet, nine |
---|
14 | 14 | | inches [and less than 36 inches in height], and does not keep the |
---|
15 | 15 | | child secured during the operation of the vehicle in a child |
---|
16 | 16 | | passenger safety seat system according to the instructions of the |
---|
17 | 17 | | manufacturer of the safety seat system. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) An offense under this section is a misdemeanor |
---|
19 | 19 | | punishable by a fine of not [less than $100 or] more than $25 for the |
---|
20 | 20 | | first offense and not more than $250 for a second or subsequent |
---|
21 | 21 | | offense [$200]. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b-1) In addition to all other fees and court costs, a |
---|
23 | 23 | | person shall pay 15 cents as a court cost on conviction of an |
---|
24 | 24 | | offense under this section. Court costs due under this section |
---|
25 | 25 | | shall be collected in the same manner as other fees, fines, or costs |
---|
26 | 26 | | are collected in the case. The clerk at least monthly shall send |
---|
27 | 27 | | the court costs collected under this section to the comptroller for |
---|
28 | 28 | | deposit in a separate account in the general revenue fund that may |
---|
29 | 29 | | be appropriated only to the Texas Department of Transportation and |
---|
30 | 30 | | used to purchase child passenger safety seat systems and distribute |
---|
31 | 31 | | them to low-income families. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 102, Government Code, is |
---|
33 | 33 | | amended by adding Section 102.104 to read as follows: |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sec. 102.104. ADDITIONAL COURT COSTS ON CONVICTION IN |
---|
35 | 35 | | JUSTICE COURTS: TRANSPORTATION CODE. The clerk of a justice court |
---|
36 | 36 | | shall collect 15 cents as a court cost under Section 545.412, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Transportation Code, on conviction of an offense under that |
---|
38 | 38 | | section. |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter G, Chapter 102, Government Code, is |
---|
40 | 40 | | amended by adding Section 102.122 to read as follows: |
---|
41 | 41 | | Sec. 102.122. ADDITIONAL COURT COSTS ON CONVICTION IN |
---|
42 | 42 | | MUNICIPAL COURT: TRANSPORTATION CODE. The clerk of a municipal |
---|
43 | 43 | | court shall collect 15 cents as a court cost under Section 545.412, |
---|
44 | 44 | | Transportation Code, on conviction of an offense under that |
---|
45 | 45 | | section. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 4. (a) Subject to Subsection (c) of this section, |
---|
47 | 47 | | the change in law made by this Act applies only to an offense |
---|
48 | 48 | | committed on or after the effective date of this Act. For the |
---|
49 | 49 | | purposes of this section, an offense is committed before the |
---|
50 | 50 | | effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurs |
---|
51 | 51 | | before that date. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (b) An offense committed before the effective date of this |
---|
53 | 53 | | Act is governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed, |
---|
54 | 54 | | and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (c) For an offense under Section 545.412, Transportation |
---|
56 | 56 | | Code, as amended by this Act, that would not have been an offense |
---|
57 | 57 | | under that section before this Act took effect, if the child who is |
---|
58 | 58 | | the subject of the offense is secured by a safety belt: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (1) the offense may be prosecuted only if the offense |
---|
60 | 60 | | occurs on or after June 1, 2010; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (2) before June 1, 2010, a law enforcement officer may |
---|
62 | 62 | | not arrest or issue a notice to appear to a person committing the |
---|
63 | 63 | | offense, but may issue to the person a warning to comply with |
---|
64 | 64 | | Section 545.412, Transportation Code, as amended by this Act. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
66 | 66 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
67 | 67 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
68 | 68 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
69 | 69 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
70 | 70 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
71 | 71 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
72 | 72 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 61 passed the Senate on |
---|
73 | 73 | | April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 23, Nays 8; and that |
---|
74 | 74 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 15, 2009, by the |
---|
75 | 75 | | following vote: Yeas 19, Nays 9. |
---|
76 | 76 | | ______________________________ |
---|
77 | 77 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
78 | 78 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 61 passed the House, with |
---|
79 | 79 | | amendment, on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 99, |
---|
80 | 80 | | Nays 44, two present not voting. |
---|
81 | 81 | | ______________________________ |
---|
82 | 82 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
83 | 83 | | Approved: |
---|
84 | 84 | | ______________________________ |
---|
85 | 85 | | Date |
---|
86 | 86 | | ______________________________ |
---|
87 | 87 | | Governor |
---|