Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB61 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 61


 AN ACT
 relating to the offense of failing to secure a child passenger in a
 motor vehicle and to fines for the offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 545.412, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a) A person commits an offense if the person operates a
 passenger vehicle, transports a child who is younger than eight
 [five] years of age, unless the child is taller than four feet, nine
 inches [and less than 36 inches in height], and does not keep the
 child secured during the operation of the vehicle in a child
 passenger safety seat system according to the instructions of the
 manufacturer of the safety seat system.
 (b) An offense under this section is a misdemeanor
 punishable by a fine of not [less than $100 or] more than $25 for the
 first offense and not more than $250 for a second or subsequent
 offense [$200].
 (b-1)  In addition to all other fees and court costs, a
 person shall pay 15 cents as a court cost on conviction of an
 offense under this section. Court costs due under this section
 shall be collected in the same manner as other fees, fines, or costs
 are collected in the case. The clerk at least monthly shall send
 the court costs collected under this section to the comptroller for
 deposit in a separate account in the general revenue fund that may
 be appropriated only to the Texas Department of Transportation and
 used to purchase child passenger safety seat systems and distribute
 them to low-income families.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 102, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 102.104 to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.104.  ADDITIONAL COURT COSTS ON CONVICTION IN
 JUSTICE COURTS: TRANSPORTATION CODE. The clerk of a justice court
 shall collect 15 cents as a court cost under Section 545.412,
 Transportation Code, on conviction of an offense under that
 section.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter G, Chapter 102, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 102.122 to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.122.  ADDITIONAL COURT COSTS ON CONVICTION IN
 MUNICIPAL COURT: TRANSPORTATION CODE. The clerk of a municipal
 court shall collect 15 cents as a court cost under Section 545.412,
 Transportation Code, on conviction of an offense under that
 section.
 SECTION 4. (a) Subject to Subsection (c) of this section,
 the change in law made by this Act applies only to an offense
 committed on or after the effective date of this Act. For the
 purposes of this section, an offense is committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurs
 before that date.
 (b) An offense committed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (c) For an offense under Section 545.412, Transportation
 Code, as amended by this Act, that would not have been an offense
 under that section before this Act took effect, if the child who is
 the subject of the offense is secured by a safety belt:
 (1) the offense may be prosecuted only if the offense
 occurs on or after June 1, 2010; and
 (2) before June 1, 2010, a law enforcement officer may
 not arrest or issue a notice to appear to a person committing the
 offense, but may issue to the person a warning to comply with
 Section 545.412, Transportation Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 61 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 23, Nays 8; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 15, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 19, Nays 9.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 61 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 99,
 Nays 44, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor