E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6971
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6971
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4653
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1201
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-D. Miller and Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4341
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1237
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1237
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1237
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1237
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 992
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|