Senate | 05/20/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 776 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 618 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 401 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 401 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |