Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB780 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson, et al. S.B. No. 780
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2009; March 4, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 19, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 19, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to disclosure of the individual vote of each member of the
 Supreme Court of Texas on a petition for review.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 22, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 22.0071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.0071.  DISCLOSURE OF INDIVIDUAL VOTES OF MEMBERS.
 In an order granting, refusing, dismissing, or denying a petition
 for review, the supreme court shall state how each member voted on
 the petition or application.
 SECTION 2. Section 22.0071, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to an order of the Supreme Court of Texas on a
 petition for review issued on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *