E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6898
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4988
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4988
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6198
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6197
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2498
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2498
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2498
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2498
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3485
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#831
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3335
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Chavez and Martinez
|
Journal Page: 3335
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3335
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/13/09 11:45 AM
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/12/09 10:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 59
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1108
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 413
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 311
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 311
|
Senate
|
02/19/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|