S.B. No. 956 AN ACT relating to the establishment of a law school in the city of Dallas by the University of North Texas System. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 105.001, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 105.001. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM. The University of North Texas System is composed of: (1) the University of North Texas; (2) the University of North Texas Health Science Center at Fort Worth; [and] (3) the University of North Texas at Dallas; and (4) the University of North Texas at Dallas College of Law. SECTION 2. Section 105.151, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) and amending Subsection (d) to read as follows: (c-1) Venue for a suit filed solely against the University of North Texas at Dallas College of Law or against officers or employees of the University of North Texas at Dallas College of Law is in Dallas County. (d) In case of a conflict between Subsection (a), (b), [or] (c), or (c-1) and any other law, Subsection (a), (b), [or] (c), or (c-1) controls. SECTION 3. Subchapter J, Chapter 105, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 105.502 to read as follows: Sec. 105.502. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM COLLEGE OF LAW. (a) The board may establish and operate a school of law in the city of Dallas as a professional school of the University of North Texas System. (b) In administering the law school, the board may prescribe courses leading to customary degrees offered at other leading American schools of law and may award those degrees. (c) Until the University of North Texas at Dallas has been administered as a general academic teaching institution for five years, the board shall administer the law school as a professional school of the system. After that period, the law school shall become a professional school of the University of North Texas at Dallas. Until the law school becomes a professional school of the University of North Texas at Dallas, the law school: (1) is considered an institution of higher education under Section 61.003 for all purposes under other law; and (2) is entitled to formula funding as if the law school were a professional school of a general academic teaching institution. (d) Before the board establishes a law school under this section, but not later than June 1, 2010, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall prepare a feasibility study to determine the actions the system must take to obtain accreditation of the law school. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall deliver a copy of the study to the chair of each legislative standing committee or subcommittee with jurisdiction over higher education. (e) The board may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private source for the purposes of this section. SECTION 4. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 61.0665 to read as follows: Sec. 61.0665. STUDY REGARDING ESTABLISHMENT OF LAW SCHOOLS. (a) The board shall conduct a study to examine the need for and feasibility of establishing a public law school in areas of the state where a law school is not located, including the Texas-Mexico border region. The study shall be conducted using the same criteria used for determining the need for and feasibility of establishing the University of North Texas at Dallas College of Law. (b) Not later than November 1, 2010, the board shall report the results of the study required by Subsection (a) to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education. (c) This section expires January 31, 2011. SECTION 5. If this Act receives a vote of at least two-thirds of the membership of each house of the legislature, the University of North Texas at Dallas College of Law created under Section 105.502, Education Code, as added by this Act, is entitled to participate in the funding provided by Section 17, Article VII, Texas Constitution. SECTION 6. This Act does not make an appropriation. This Act takes effect only if a specific appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a general appropriations act of the 81st Legislature. SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 956 passed the Senate on April 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; May 18, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 25, 2009, House granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 956 passed the House, with amendments, on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 108, Nays 35, one present not voting; May 25, 2009, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 112, Nays 24, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor