1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 956 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the establishment of a law school in the city of Dallas |
---|
6 | 6 | | by the University of North Texas System. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 105.001, Education Code, is amended to |
---|
9 | 9 | | read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 105.001. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM. The |
---|
11 | 11 | | University of North Texas System is composed of: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) the University of North Texas; |
---|
13 | 13 | | (2) the University of North Texas Health Science |
---|
14 | 14 | | Center at Fort Worth; [and] |
---|
15 | 15 | | (3) the University of North Texas at Dallas; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | (4) the University of North Texas at Dallas College of |
---|
17 | 17 | | Law. |
---|
18 | 18 | | SECTION 2. Section 105.151, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
19 | 19 | | adding Subsection (c-1) and amending Subsection (d) to read as |
---|
20 | 20 | | follows: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (c-1) Venue for a suit filed solely against the University |
---|
22 | 22 | | of North Texas at Dallas College of Law or against officers or |
---|
23 | 23 | | employees of the University of North Texas at Dallas College of Law |
---|
24 | 24 | | is in Dallas County. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (d) In case of a conflict between Subsection (a), (b), [or] |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c), or (c-1) and any other law, Subsection (a), (b), [or] (c), or |
---|
27 | 27 | | (c-1) controls. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter J, Chapter 105, Education Code, is |
---|
29 | 29 | | amended by adding Section 105.502 to read as follows: |
---|
30 | 30 | | Sec. 105.502. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM COLLEGE OF |
---|
31 | 31 | | LAW. (a) The board may establish and operate a school of law in |
---|
32 | 32 | | the city of Dallas as a professional school of the University of |
---|
33 | 33 | | North Texas System. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (b) In administering the law school, the board may prescribe |
---|
35 | 35 | | courses leading to customary degrees offered at other leading |
---|
36 | 36 | | American schools of law and may award those degrees. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (c) Until the University of North Texas at Dallas has been |
---|
38 | 38 | | administered as a general academic teaching institution for five |
---|
39 | 39 | | years, the board shall administer the law school as a professional |
---|
40 | 40 | | school of the system. After that period, the law school shall |
---|
41 | 41 | | become a professional school of the University of North Texas at |
---|
42 | 42 | | Dallas. Until the law school becomes a professional school of the |
---|
43 | 43 | | University of North Texas at Dallas, the law school: |
---|
44 | 44 | | (1) is considered an institution of higher education |
---|
45 | 45 | | under Section 61.003 for all purposes under other law; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) is entitled to formula funding as if the law school |
---|
47 | 47 | | were a professional school of a general academic teaching |
---|
48 | 48 | | institution. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (d) Before the board establishes a law school under this |
---|
50 | 50 | | section, but not later than June 1, 2010, the Texas Higher Education |
---|
51 | 51 | | Coordinating Board shall prepare a feasibility study to determine |
---|
52 | 52 | | the actions the system must take to obtain accreditation of the law |
---|
53 | 53 | | school. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall |
---|
54 | 54 | | deliver a copy of the study to the chair of each legislative |
---|
55 | 55 | | standing committee or subcommittee with jurisdiction over higher |
---|
56 | 56 | | education. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (e) The board may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and |
---|
58 | 58 | | donations from any public or private source for the purposes of this |
---|
59 | 59 | | section. |
---|
60 | 60 | | SECTION 4. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
61 | 61 | | amended by adding Section 61.0665 to read as follows: |
---|
62 | 62 | | Sec. 61.0665. STUDY REGARDING ESTABLISHMENT OF LAW SCHOOLS. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (a) The board shall conduct a study to examine the need for and |
---|
64 | 64 | | feasibility of establishing a public law school in areas of the |
---|
65 | 65 | | state where a law school is not located, including the Texas-Mexico |
---|
66 | 66 | | border region. The study shall be conducted using the same criteria |
---|
67 | 67 | | used for determining the need for and feasibility of establishing |
---|
68 | 68 | | the University of North Texas at Dallas College of Law. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (b) Not later than November 1, 2010, the board shall report |
---|
70 | 70 | | the results of the study required by Subsection (a) to the governor, |
---|
71 | 71 | | lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and |
---|
72 | 72 | | presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with |
---|
73 | 73 | | primary jurisdiction over higher education. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (c) This section expires January 31, 2011. |
---|
75 | 75 | | SECTION 5. If this Act receives a vote of at least |
---|
76 | 76 | | two-thirds of the membership of each house of the legislature, the |
---|
77 | 77 | | University of North Texas at Dallas College of Law created under |
---|
78 | 78 | | Section 105.502, Education Code, as added by this Act, is entitled |
---|
79 | 79 | | to participate in the funding provided by Section 17, Article VII, |
---|
80 | 80 | | Texas Constitution. |
---|
81 | 81 | | SECTION 6. This Act does not make an appropriation. This |
---|
82 | 82 | | Act takes effect only if a specific appropriation for the |
---|
83 | 83 | | implementation of the Act is provided in a general appropriations |
---|
84 | 84 | | act of the 81st Legislature. |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
86 | 86 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
87 | 87 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
88 | 88 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
89 | 89 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
90 | 90 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
91 | 91 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
92 | 92 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 956 passed the Senate on |
---|
93 | 93 | | April 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; |
---|
94 | 94 | | May 18, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
95 | 95 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 25, 2009, House |
---|
96 | 96 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
97 | 97 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 30, |
---|
98 | 98 | | Nays 1. |
---|
99 | 99 | | ______________________________ |
---|
100 | 100 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
101 | 101 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 956 passed the House, with |
---|
102 | 102 | | amendments, on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 108, |
---|
103 | 103 | | Nays 35, one present not voting; May 25, 2009, House granted |
---|
104 | 104 | | request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
105 | 105 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
106 | 106 | | following vote: Yeas 112, Nays 24, one present not voting. |
---|
107 | 107 | | ______________________________ |
---|
108 | 108 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
109 | 109 | | Approved: |
---|
110 | 110 | | ______________________________ |
---|
111 | 111 | | Date |
---|
112 | 112 | | ______________________________ |
---|
113 | 113 | | Governor |
---|