E | 03/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 498 | |
E | 03/11/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 469 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 461 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 620 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 620 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 434 | |
House | 02/24/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 416 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |