Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR30 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.C.R. No. 30


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The State of Texas lost a longtime state official on
 January 14, 2009, with the passing of Jess M. Irwin, Jr., a very
 experienced and accomplished man of family and faith who served his
 state and his country throughout his life; and
 WHEREAS, A Texas native, Jess M. Irwin, Jr., was born
 September 24, 1912, in Dallas and graduated from Oak Cliff High
 School before beginning his career with the state; and
 WHEREAS, He proudly served as an infantryman in the 232nd
 Infantry Regiment, 42nd "Rainbow" Division in Europe during World
 War II, where he experienced combat and witnessed the horror of the
 Dachau concentration camp; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Irwin returned home to Texas after serving his
 country to resume an illustrious career with the State of Texas that
 included his involvement in the creation of the Legislative Budget
 Board and service in a number of notable positions; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Irwin served as budget director for Governors
 Allen Shivers and Price Daniel, executive director of the board for
 Texas State Hospitals and Special Schools, commissioner of the
 Texas Rehabilitation Commission, member of the board for the Texas
 Rehabilitation Commission, member of the Surplus Property Board,
 member of the Sunset Commission, and executive director of the
 Texas State Government Economy and Efficiency Commission; and
 WHEREAS, An accomplished state official with an unwavering
 dedication to duty, Jess M. Irwin, Jr., set an admirable example of
 service to one's country and state; through his love for Texas and
 his honorable service in numerous positions with the state, he has
 left Texas a better place; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby honor the life of Jess M. Irwin, Jr., and extend deepest
 sympathy to his family, which he considered to be his greatest
 success: his daughter and son-in-law, Sylvia and Charles Betts;
 his son and daughter-in-law, Jess and Trudy Irwin; his
 grandchildren, Kris Adrian; Ruthanne Betts; Desiny Villarreal and
 her husband, John; Sarah Swanson and her husband, Chris; and Matt
 Irwin; his three great-grandchildren, Hannah Adrian, Alex
 Villarreal, and Clarissa Villarreal; and his other relatives and
 many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this resolution be prepared for his
 family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Legislature, and that when the legislature adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of Jess M. Irwin, Jr.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 30 was adopted by the Senate
 on February 23, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 30 was adopted by the House
 on March 10, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor